ID S1269 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BATTERY -- Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the crimes of sexual battery and aggravated sexual battery, to provide punishments and to provide that the Sexual Offender Registration Notification and Community Right-to-Know Act shall apply to any person who commits aggravated sexual battery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the crimes of sexual battery and aggravated sexual battery, to provide punishments and to provide that the Sexual Offender Registration Notification and Community Right-to-Know Act shall apply to any person who commits aggravated sexual battery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSession Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-22HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-22SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-21SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-21Houseto Senate
2018-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-21HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-27Senateto House
2018-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-02-26SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-23SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-22SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-07SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback