ID S1268 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Session Law Chapter 92 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DRAINAGE DISTRICTS -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise drainage commissioner compensation provisions; to provide for assessment for the payment or retirement of any bonds or warrants; to revise provisions regarding the sale of personal property of a drainage district; and to provide for the trade-in or exchange of personal property of the district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to revise drainage commissioner compensation provisions; to provide for assessment for the payment or retirement of any bonds or warrants; to revise provisions regarding the sale of personal property of a drainage district; and to provide for the trade-in or exchange of personal property of the district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateSession Law Chapter 92 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-08SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-08HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-07SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-07SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-06Houseto Senate
2018-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-6-3
2018-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-02HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-19HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2018-02-19HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-16Senateto House
2018-02-16SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-16SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-07SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback