ID S1266 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to remove the requirement that two semester credits of mathematics must be taken in the final year of high school.
Title
Amends existing law to remove the requirement that two semester credits of mathematics must be taken in the final year of high school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-1-4 |
2018-03-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2018-02-15 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |