ID S1264 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Session Law Chapter 144 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Session Law Chapter 144 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SELF-SERVICE STORAGE FACILITIES -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding rental agreements and liens, to provide for a procedure in the event of default where the property stored in the leased space is a vehicle or trailer, and to provide for when an operator may restrict access to the leased space.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding rental agreements and liens, to provide for a procedure in the event of default where the property stored in the leased space is a vehicle or trailer, and to provide for when an operator may restrict access to the leased space.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 144 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2020-03-12 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-10 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-10 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-2-0 |
2020-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2020-02-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |