ID S1264 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
Pending: House Transportation and Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide that former military vehicles may be titled and registered under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide that former military vehicles may be titled and registered under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2018-02-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-20Senateto House
2018-02-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-20SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-02-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-05SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2018-02-02SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback