ID S1264 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
Pending: House Transportation and Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
Pending: House Transportation and Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide that former military vehicles may be titled and registered under certain circumstances.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide that former military vehicles may be titled and registered under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2018-02-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |