ID S1255 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Session Law Chapter 13 Effective: 03/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Session Law Chapter 13 Effective: 03/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to establish the Empowering Parents Grant Program, which provides funds to eligible students for certain education expenses.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish the Empowering Parents Grant Program, which provides funds to eligible students for certain education expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 13 Effective: 03/01/2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-02-24 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-02-23 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-1-2 |
2022-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 21, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-11 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2022-02-11 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |