ID S1254 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 227 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WIRELESS TELEPHONE SERVICE -- Adds to existing law to authorize a court to issue an order to transfer wireless telephone service, billing responsibility and telephone numbers to a party that is not the account holder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to authorize a court to issue an order to transfer wireless telephone service, billing responsibility and telephone numbers to a party that is not the account holder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateSession Law Chapter 227 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-20HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-19SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-16Houseto Senate
2018-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-16HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2018-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-09HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-02-09HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-08Senateto House
2018-02-08SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-08SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0
2018-02-07SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-01SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback