ID S1253 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 03/21/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 03/21/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to service by publication to allow an affidavit to be used to show that a cause of action exists against the defendant in respect to whom service is made.
Title
Amends existing law relating to service by publication to allow an affidavit to be used to show that a cause of action exists against the defendant in respect to whom service is made.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 03/21/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/15 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor | |
2012-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-14 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-13 | To enrol | |
2012-03-12 | to Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-12 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 63-0-7 | |
2012-02-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-14 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-14 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-07 | to Jud | |
2012-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-07 | House intro | |
2012-02-06 | to House | |
2012-02-06 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-06 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-02-03 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-03 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-25 | to Jud | |
2012-01-25 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-24 | to printing | |
2012-01-24 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-24 | Senate intro |