ID S1249 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Session Law Chapter 97 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to require public institutions of higher education to notify students of the option to register as an organ donor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to require public institutions of higher education to notify students of the option to register as an organ donor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateSession Law Chapter 97 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-12SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-09HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-08SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-07SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-07Houseto Senate
2018-03-07HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-07HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 37-31-2
2018-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-13HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-13HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-12Senateto House
2018-02-12SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 21-10-4
2018-02-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-01-31SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback