ID S1248 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ORGAN DONORS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding notification in the event of a donor's death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding notification in the event of a donor's death.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-20Senateto House
2018-02-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-20SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-02-15SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2018-02-14SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-02-14SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-02-13SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2018-02-13SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2018-02-13SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-07SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-01-31SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback