ID S1243 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 159 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ABORTION -- Amends existing law to require certain information about abortion to be posted on the Department of Health and Welfare website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to require certain information about abortion to be posted on the Department of Health and Welfare website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSession Law Chapter 159 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-15SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-14HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-14SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-13SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-12Houseto Senate
2018-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-12HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-11-4
2018-03-09HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-21HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2018-02-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-20Senateto House
2018-02-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-20SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 29-6-0
2018-02-16SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-01-30SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback