ID S1243 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 159 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 159 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ABORTION -- Amends existing law to require certain information about abortion to be posted on the Department of Health and Welfare website.
Title
Amends existing law to require certain information about abortion to be posted on the Department of Health and Welfare website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 159 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-11-4 |
2018-03-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2018-02-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 29-6-0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |