ID S1239 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATURE -- Amends existing law to provide that a regular session of the Legislature shall adjourn by a certain date and to provide exceptions.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a regular session of the Legislature shall adjourn by a certain date and to provide exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 28-6-1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |