ID S1236 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and repeals existing law relating to commercial feed to revise provisions relating to registration and to provide for the review of labels; to provide for separate notices for each inspection; and to provide for receipts relating to any sample or samples taken in the course of an inspection.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law relating to commercial feed to revise provisions relating to registration and to provide for the review of labels; to provide for separate notices for each inspection; and to provide for receipts relating to any sample or samples taken in the course of an inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/15 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor | |
2012-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-14 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-14 | To enrol | |
2012-03-13 | to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-13 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 55-9-6 | |
2012-03-01 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-29 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-02-15 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-15 | House intro | |
2012-02-14 | to House | |
2012-02-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-02-10 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-23 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-01-23 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-20 | to printing | |
2012-01-20 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-20 | Senate intro |