ID S1235 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 156 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

NURSES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the Idaho Board of Nursing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the Idaho Board of Nursing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSession Law Chapter 156 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-15SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-15HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-14SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-14SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-13Houseto Senate
2018-03-13HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5
2018-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-09HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-19HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-19HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-16Senateto House
2018-02-16SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-16SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-01-29SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2018-01-26SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback