ID S1231 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - U.C. to be placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to provide for electronic registration of certain commercial vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for electronic registration of certain commercial vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders
2020-02-10HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-02-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 10, 2020
2020-02-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2020-01-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-01-24Senateto House
2020-01-24SenateTitle apvd
2020-01-24SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2020-01-23SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-01-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-01-16SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2020-01-15SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback