ID S1226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Session Law Chapter 71 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Session Law Chapter 71 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE -- Amends existing law to revise a definition.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 71 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-07 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-02 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-02 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2018-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2018-02-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |