ID S1220 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TERRORIST CONTROL ACT -- Amends existing law to provide for the crime of domestic terrorism.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the crime of domestic terrorism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2024-01-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | to House |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-8-0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |