ID S1219 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

GUARDIANS AND CONSERVATORS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions for the appointment of guardians and conservators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions for the appointment of guardians and conservators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2020-01-24HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-01-23Senateto House
2020-01-23SenateTitle apvd
2020-01-23SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2020-01-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-01-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-01-15SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback