ID S1218 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Session Law Chapter 22 Effective: 03/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY -- Amends and adds to existing law regarding poultry animal feeding operations; to provide that specified law shall not affect the authority of the Department of Environmental Quality to administer and enforce an Idaho NPDES program; to provide that the director of the Department of Environmental Quality shall consult with the director of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture before certifying discharges from poultry operations; and to provide for the Idaho Pollutant Discharge Elimination System Program and fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law regarding poultry animal feeding operations; to provide that specified law shall not affect the authority of the Department of Environmental Quality to administer and enforce an Idaho NPDES program; to provide that the director of the Department of Environmental Quality shall consult with the director of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture before certifying discharges from poultry operations; and to provide for the Idaho Pollutant Discharge Elimination System Program and fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateSession Law Chapter 22 Effective: 03/01/2018
2018-02-28SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-02-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-02-26SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-02-23SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-02-22Houseto Senate
2018-02-22HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-12-3
2018-02-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-09HouseRead First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology
2018-02-09HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-07Senateto House
2018-02-07SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-07SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-1-2
2018-02-02SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-01SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-01-22SenateReported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback