ID S1218 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Session Law Chapter 22 Effective: 03/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Session Law Chapter 22 Effective: 03/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY -- Amends and adds to existing law regarding poultry animal feeding operations; to provide that specified law shall not affect the authority of the Department of Environmental Quality to administer and enforce an Idaho NPDES program; to provide that the director of the Department of Environmental Quality shall consult with the director of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture before certifying discharges from poultry operations; and to provide for the Idaho Pollutant Discharge Elimination System Program and fund.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law regarding poultry animal feeding operations; to provide that specified law shall not affect the authority of the Department of Environmental Quality to administer and enforce an Idaho NPDES program; to provide that the director of the Department of Environmental Quality shall consult with the director of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture before certifying discharges from poultry operations; and to provide for the Idaho Pollutant Discharge Elimination System Program and fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 22 Effective: 03/01/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-02-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-12-3 |
2018-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-09 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology |
2018-02-09 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-1-2 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |