ID S1211 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Session Law Chapter 307 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Session Law Chapter 307 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WOLVES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the powers and duties of the Idaho Wolf Depredation Control Board, wolf control assessments, the taking of wolves, and the control of depredation of wolves on livestock, domestic animals, and wildlife populations.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the powers and duties of the Idaho Wolf Depredation Control Board, wolf control assessments, the taking of wolves, and the control of depredation of wolves on livestock, domestic animals, and wildlife populations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 307 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-05-03 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-04-27 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-27 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 58-11-1 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2021-04-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 26-7-2 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |