ID S1211 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the Professional Standards Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the Professional Standards Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2018-03-08HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-07Senateto House
2018-03-07SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-07SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-07SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-07SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2018-03-06SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2018-03-06SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2018-03-06SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-03-06SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2018-03-06SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2018-03-06SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-23SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-01-18SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback