ID S1211 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the Professional Standards Commission.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the Professional Standards Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2018-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |