ID S1207 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SEED INDEMNITY FUND LAW -- Amends existing law to provide certain net worth and bond requirements, to provide that the director of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture may deny the issuance of a license or renewal based on specified criteria and after a public hearing and to provide for judicial review of final determinations.
Title
Amends existing law to provide certain net worth and bond requirements, to provide that the director of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture may deny the issuance of a license or renewal based on specified criteria and after a public hearing and to provide for judicial review of final determinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-15 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-0-6 |
2018-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |