ID S1206 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 311 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- SUPREME COURT -- Relates to the appropriation to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateSession Law Chapter 311 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-04SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-04-02SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-04-01Houseto Senate
2019-04-01HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 62-7-1
2019-03-29HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-28HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-27Senateto House
2019-03-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-03-27SenateRead in full as required)
2019-03-27SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-03-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-25SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2019-03-22SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback