ID S1205 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Filed in the office of the Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ADMINISTRATIVE RULES -- Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules set to expire on July 1, 2019, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2020, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2020, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void, and of no force and effect, and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules set to expire on July 1, 2019, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2020, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2020, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void, and of no force and effect, and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateFiled in the office of the Secretary of the Senate
2019-04-10SenateSenate did not Concur in House Amendments
2019-04-10SenateReferred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
2019-04-10SenateReturned from House, amended
2019-04-10Houseto Senate
2019-04-10HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-10HouseRules Suspended:
2019-04-10HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2019-04-10HouseFiled for First Reading
2019-04-10HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-04-10HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-04-04HouseRetained on General Orders
2019-04-02HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-03-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-26Senateto House
2019-03-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-21SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback