ID S1204 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 04/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

MEDICAID -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding Medicaid eligibility expansion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding Medicaid eligibility expansion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateSession Law Chapter 318 Effective: 04/09/2019
2019-04-08SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-08HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-04-05Senateto enrol
2019-04-05SenateTitle apvd
2019-04-05SenateRead third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 19-16-0
2019-04-05SenateRead in full as required)
2019-04-05SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-04-05SenateRead first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
2019-04-05SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-04-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
2019-04-05SenateReported out with recommendation not to concur in House amendment; to 10th order
2019-04-05SenateReferred to Health & Welfare for concurrence recommendation
2019-04-05SenateReturned from House, amended
2019-04-04Houseto Senate
2019-04-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-04HouseRules Suspended:
2019-04-04HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2019-04-04HouseFiled for First Reading
2019-04-04HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-04-04HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-04-04HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-04-03HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-04-03HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-04-03HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-04-02Senateto House
2019-04-02SenateTitle apvd
2019-04-02SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 20-15-0
2019-04-02SenateRead in full as required)
2019-04-02SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-04-02SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-04-01SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-04-01SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-04-01SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-04-01SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-04-01SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-04-01SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-26SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-20SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback