ID S1204 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- ADMINISTRATION DEPARTMENT -- Appropriates an additional $77,000 to the Department of Administration for the Office of Group Insurance for fiscal year 2018.
Title
Appropriates an additional $77,000 to the Department of Administration for the Office of Group Insurance for fiscal year 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-24 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-24 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |