ID S1204 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-28 - Signed by Governor on 02/28/14 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-28 - Signed by Governor on 02/28/14 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to remove a term relating to determination of veteran's preference for state and public employment purposes.
Title
Amends existing law to remove a term relating to determination of veteran's preference for state and public employment purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 02/28/14 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 02/27/14 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-02-26 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-21 | House | PASSED -- 63-0-7 |
2014-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-11 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2014-02-11 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-02-10 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-10 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |