ID S1202 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Session Law Chapter 305 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Session Law Chapter 305 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- OFFICE OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 305 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-05-03 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-04-29 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-29 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-29 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 52-17-0 |
2021-04-29 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 26, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 31-4-0 -Engelking |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |