ID S1201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 308 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to phase out the distribution of funds from the Highway Distribution Account to the Law Enforcement Account, and reallocating those funds to local units of government and the State Highway Account for transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to phase out the distribution of funds from the Highway Distribution Account to the Law Enforcement Account, and reallocating those funds to local units of government and the State Highway Account for transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateSession Law Chapter 308 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-04SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-04-02SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-04-01Houseto Senate
2019-04-01HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 56-13-1
2019-03-29HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-28HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-27HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-21HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-20Senateto House
2019-03-20SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-20SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 19-15-1
2019-03-20SenateRead in full as required)
2019-03-20SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-03-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-18SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback