ID S1199 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 244 Effective: 07/01/00
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 244 Effective: 07/01/00
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide additional exempt activities from the Idaho Competition Act if certain conditions occur by Competitive Marketing Associations.
Title
Amends existing law to provide additional exempt activities from the Idaho Competition Act if certain conditions occur by Competitive Marketing Associations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 244 Effective: 07/01/00 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/07 | |
2011-04-06 | To Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-05 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-05 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-05 | To enrol | |
2011-04-05 | to Senate | |
2011-04-05 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-05 | Stevenson | |
2011-04-05 | 68-0-2 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb(McCoy), Burgoyne, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Raybould Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-05 | PASSED | |
2011-04-05 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-05 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-05 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-04 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-04 | rec d/p | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-31 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-31 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-31 | House intro | |
2011-03-30 | to House | |
2011-03-30 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-30 | Hill | |
2011-03-30 | 35-0-0 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2011-03-30 | PASSED | |
2011-03-30 | Rls susp | |
2011-03-30 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-30 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-28 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-28 | to printing | |
2011-03-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-28 | Senate intro |