ID S1197 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- BOARD OF TAX APPEALS -- Relates to the appropriation to the Board of Tax Appeals for fiscal year 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Board of Tax Appeals for fiscal year 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-04-21 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-04-19 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-19 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2021-04-19 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 19, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-04-12 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |