ID S1197 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Session Law Chapter 323 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- WATER RESOURCES -- Appropriates an additional $300,000 from the General Fund to the Department of Water Resources for fiscal year 2018; and authorizes an additional 2 full-time equivalent positions for fiscal year 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates an additional $300,000 from the General Fund to the Department of Water Resources for fiscal year 2018; and authorizes an additional 2 full-time equivalent positions for fiscal year 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11SenateSession Law Chapter 323 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-29SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2017-03-28HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2017-03-27SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2017-03-27SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2017-03-24Houseto Senate
2017-03-24HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-24HouseRules Suspended:
2017-03-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-23HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-23HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-03-22Senateto House
2017-03-22SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-22SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2017-03-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-21SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2017-03-20SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback