ID S1195 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - U.C. to be returned to Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COLLECTION AGENCIES -- Amends existing law to provide for attorney's fees and litigation costs in certain instances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for attorney's fees and litigation costs in certain instances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseU.C. to be returned to Business Committee
2019-04-04HouseRetained on General Orders
2019-04-01HouseRetained on General Orders
2019-04-01HouseRetained on General Orders
2019-03-27HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-03-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2019-03-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-21Senateto House
2019-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-03-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback