ID S1193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Session Law Chapter 223 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- SPECIAL PROGRAMS -- Relates to the appropriation to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for Special Programs for fiscal year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for Special Programs for fiscal year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSession Law Chapter 223 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-20SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-19Houseto Senate
2019-03-19HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-19HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 38-30-2
2019-03-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-15HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-15HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-14Senateto House
2019-03-14SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-14SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 31-2-2
2019-03-14SenateRead in full as required)
2019-03-14SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-03-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback