ID S1190 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 314 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 314 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $1,838,300 to the Secretary of State for fiscal year 2012; and limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 30.
Title
Appropriates $1,838,300 to the Secretary of State for fiscal year 2012; and limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 30.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 314 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/07 | |
2011-04-06 | To Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-05 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-05 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-04 | To enrol | |
2011-04-04 | to Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-04 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 70-0-0 | |
2011-04-01 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-31 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-31 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-31 | House intro | |
2011-03-30 | to House | |
2011-03-30 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-30 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-28 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-25 | to Fin | |
2011-03-25 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-24 | to printing | |
2011-03-24 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-24 | Senate intro |