ID S1187 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Session Law Chapter 268 Effective: 04/02/2019 SECTION 4; 07/01/2019 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- MILLENNIUM FUND -- Relates to the appropriation from the Idaho Millennium Income Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation from the Idaho Millennium Income Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateSession Law Chapter 268 Effective: 04/02/2019 SECTION 4; 07/01/2019 all other SECTIONS
2019-03-29SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-28HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-27SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-27SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-26Houseto Senate
2019-03-26HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-22-3
2019-03-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-22HouseU.C. to place at bottom of Senate bills of third reading calendar Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-19HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-19HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-18Senateto House
2019-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-18SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback