ID S1186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - 6; 07/01/2021 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - 6; 07/01/2021 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- STATE TREASURER -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Treasurer for fiscal years 2021 and 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Treasurer for fiscal years 2021 and 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | 6; 07/01/2021 all other SECTIONS |
2021-04-16 | House | Session Law Chapter 253 Effective: 04/16/2021 SECTION 4 |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-04-12 | Senate | to Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-04-07 | House | to House |
2021-04-07 | House | No motion for reconsideration received |
2021-03-18 | House | Held at Desk |
2021-03-18 | House | Notice to reconsider |
2021-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |