ID S1184 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH AND WELFARE -- PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICES -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateSession Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-08SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-08HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-04-05SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-04-05Houseto Senate
2019-04-05HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-05HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 46-21-3
2019-04-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-29HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-26HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-22HouseU.C. to place at bottom of Senate bills of third reading calendar Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-19HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-15HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-15HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-14Senateto House
2019-03-14SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-14SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback