ID S1179 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITIES -- Relates to the appropriation to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for College and Universities and the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal years 2021 and 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for College and Universities and the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal years 2021 and 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Order ret’d to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Previously Read in Full -- FAILED 13-57-0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-6-2 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |