ID S1178 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EXPLODING TARGETS -- Adds to existing law to provide restrictions regarding the use of exploding targets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide restrictions regarding the use of exploding targets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReturned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
2019-03-26HouseOrder ret’d to Senate
2019-03-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 33-35-2
2019-03-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-19HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-03-19HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-18Senateto House
2019-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-18SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 27-8-0
2019-03-15SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-03-14SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-03-14SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-03-14SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-14SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-03-14SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-13SenateRead third time in full
2019-03-12SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-11SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-07SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback