ID S1177 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HORSE RACING -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the distribution and use of certain funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the distribution and use of certain funds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-20SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-18SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-07SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback