ID S1176 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor on 04/10/15 Session Law Chapter 313 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor on 04/10/15 Session Law Chapter 313 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITIES - Appropriates $520,478,300 to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for college and universities and the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2016; provides certain reappropriation authority; provides legislative intent for systemwide needs; provides legislative intent for the Complete College Idaho initiative; and exempts appropriation object and program transfer limitations.
Title
Appropriates $520,478,300 to the State Board of Education and the Board of Regents of the University of Idaho for college and universities and the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2016; provides certain reappropriation authority; provides legislative intent for systemwide needs; provides legislative intent for the Complete College Idaho initiative; and exempts appropriation object and program transfer limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/10/15 Session Law Chapter 313 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/08/15 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-04-01 | House | to Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Title apvd |
2015-04-01 | House | PASSED -- 60-9-1 |
2015-04-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-31 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-30 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Lacey |
2015-03-25 | Senate | 35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-25 | Senate | PASSED |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |