ID S1167 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Signed by Governor on 03/29/13 Session Law Chapter 202 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $1,991,400 to the Secretary of State for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 27; and provides guidance for employee compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $1,991,400 to the Secretary of State for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 27; and provides guidance for employee compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-29SenateSigned by Governor on 03/29/13 Session Law Chapter 202 Effective: 07/01/13
2013-03-28SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/27/13
2013-03-27SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2013-03-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2013-03-26SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2013-03-25SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2013-03-25Houseto Senate
2013-03-25HouseTitle apvd
2013-03-25HousePASSED -- 61-3-6
2013-03-25HouseRead Third Time in Full
2013-03-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-03-21HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2013-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2013-03-20Senateto House
2013-03-20SenateTitle apvd
2013-03-20SenatePASSED -- 33-1-1
2013-03-20SenateRead third time in full
2013-03-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-03-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-03-15SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2013-03-14SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback