ID S1165 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 04/04/2017 SECTION 8; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 04/04/2017 SECTION 8; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH AND WELFARE -- PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICES -- Appropriates $114,110,000 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Public Health Services Division for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 234.69; provides for transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; limits the transfer of funds budgeted for trustee and benefit payments; provides for program integrity; provides for specific use of General Fund moneys; requires an annual report on accreditation status; and appropriates an additional $1,070,300 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Physical Health Services Program for fiscal year 2017.
Title
Appropriates $114,110,000 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Public Health Services Division for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 234.69; provides for transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; limits the transfer of funds budgeted for trustee and benefit payments; provides for program integrity; provides for specific use of General Fund moneys; requires an annual report on accreditation status; and appropriates an additional $1,070,300 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Physical Health Services Program for fiscal year 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 04/04/2017 SECTION 8; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-24 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-22 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-15-0 |
2017-03-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-17 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-17 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |