ID S1159 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

INITIATIVES -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise ballot initiative requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to revise ballot initiative requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateRecommitted to State Affairs
2019-04-02SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-02HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-01SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-04-01SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-29Houseto Senate
2019-03-29HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-29HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 40-30-0
2019-03-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2019-03-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-22Senateto House
2019-03-22SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-22SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 18-17-0
2019-03-22SenateRead in full as required)
2019-03-22SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-03-22SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-03-21SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-03-21SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-03-21SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-21SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-03-21SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-03-21SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-20SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-06SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback