ID S1159 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor on 04/09/15 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor on 04/09/15 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - SUPREME COURT - Appropriates $65,318,700 to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2016; and exempts appropriation from object and program transfer limitations.
Title
Appropriates $65,318,700 to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2016; and exempts appropriation from object and program transfer limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/09/15 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/07/15 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-03-31 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-31 | House | PASSED -- 66-1-3 |
2015-03-31 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-30 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 30, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-20 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Guthrie |
2015-03-19 | Senate | 35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | PASSED |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |